IL HB5351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning coverage for telehealth services, if an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance provides coverage for telehealth services, it must provide coverage for licensed dietitians, nutritionists, and diabetes educators who counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes to remove the hurdle of transportation for patients to receive treatment. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may authorize licensed dietitians, nutritionists, and diabetes educators to counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes to remove the hurdle of transportation for patients to receive treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TELEHEALTH-DIABETES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.22Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback