IL HB5351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning coverage for telehealth services, provides that if an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance provides coverage for telehealth services, it must provide coverage for licensed dietitians, nutritionists, and diabetes educators who counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes to remove the hurdle of transportation for patients to receive treatment. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may authorize licensed dietitians, nutritionists, and diabetes educators to counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes to remove the hurdle of transportation for patients to receive treatment.
Title
TELEHEALTH-DIABETES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1009 |
2018-08-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |