IL HB5349 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Adds language providing that an employer who has been demanded by the Director of Labor or ordered by the court to pay wages due an employee is also liable to the Department for 20% of the unpaid wages, and that an employer who fails to pay penalties or wages that have been so ordered within 15 calendar days after the demand or order is entered is also liable to pay a penalty of 1% per calendar day to the employee for each day of delay in paying such wages to the employee up to an amount equal to twice the sum of unpaid wages due the employee. Deletes language providing that an employer who has been demanded by the Director or ordered by the court to pay wages due an employee and who fails to do so within 15 days after the demand or order is entered is liable to pay a penalty of 1% per calendar day to the employee for each day of delay in paying the wages to the employee up to an amount equal to twice the sum of unpaid wages due the employee and is also liable to the Department for 20% of the unpaid wages. Effective immediately.
Title
WAGE PAYMENT COLLECT-PENALTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2010-02-25 | Motion Prevailed | |
2010-02-25 | Moved to - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5349&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5349.htm |