IL HB5326 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that permanent vehicle registration plates shall be issued for a one-time fee of $8 to vehicles owned by counties, townships, or municipal corporations used for the purpose of ridesharing.
Title
LOCAL GOV'T RIDESHARING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1074 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 113-002-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-808.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |