IL HB5323 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides, in a provision concerning the regulation of greenhouse gases, that a specific greenhouse gas emission limit does not apply to black start facilities. Prohibits any gas turbine located at a black start facility from exceeding more than 3,200 hours of operation a year. Defines "black start facility".
Title
EPA-GHG-BLACK START
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 9.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5323&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5323.htm |