IL HB5304 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall develop a plan for implementing 14 specified actions (relating primarily to activities of the Division of Alcoholism and Substance Abuse and the Division of Mental Health), including necessary legislative action and rule changes, so that all 14 actions can be implemented by January 1, 2013. Requires that the implementation plan include recommendations for necessary legislative action and changes in rules. Requires the Department to file the plan with the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2012. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-SUBST ABUSE-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. David Leitch [R] |
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | To Human Services Subcommittee on Medicaid & Provider Rate Reform | |
2010-04-19 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-03-25 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-24 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2010-02-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2010-02-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-17 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |