IL HB5303 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0912
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board Division of the Counties Code. Limits provisions regarding disciplinary measures prescribed by the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board that may be taken by the sheriff to termination (rather than any disciplinary measures not exceeding 30 days). Provides that all disciplinary measures other than termination must be taken in accordance with any applicable collective bargaining agreement and provisions of the Code concerning removal, demotion, or suspension. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SHERIFF'S MERIT BD-DISCIPLINE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0912
2018-08-17HouseEffective Date August 17, 2018
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-7011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback