IL HB5278 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Student Confidential Reporting Act. Subject to appropriation, requires the Illinois State Police, in consultation with the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, State Board of Education, Department of Children and Family Services, and the Department of Human Services, to establish a program for receiving reports and other information from the public regarding potential self-harm or potential harm or criminal acts directed at school students, school employees, or schools in this State. Requires the program to include a Safe2Help Illinois helpline (defined as a school helpline involving a statewide toll-free telephone number, social media, a website, or other means of communication, or a combination of a toll-free telephone number and another means of communication, that transmits voice, text, photographic, or other messages and information to the Safe2Help Illinois operators). Provides for referrals from and the discontinuance of other State-run school violence help lines (excluding the CPS Violence Prevention Hotline). Sets forth other program and Illinois State Police requirements. Contains provisions concerning the confidentiality of reported information, funding, and annual reporting. Provides that a Safe2Help Illinois employee, law enforcement agency, or law enforcement official acting in good faith in compliance with the Act shall have immunity from any civil or criminal liability that might otherwise occur as a result of handling tips, with the exception of willful or wanton misconduct. Provides that the Illinois State Police may adopt emergency rules to implement the Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
STATE POLICE-SCHOOL HELPLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5278&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5278.htm |