IL HB5224 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the operation and effect of the provisions of the Election Code authorizing automatic voter registration are suspended from the effective date of the amendatory Act through December 31, 2021. Provides that the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the Secretary of State, other designated government agencies, and a statewide association representing county clerks and recorders, shall review voter registration information acquired by the Board under the automatic voter registration provisions of the Code from July 2, 2018 through the effective date of the amendatory Act in order to determine whether any persons were improperly registered to vote and to remove any improperly registered voters from the rolls. Provides that the Board, in consultation with the Secretary of State, shall conduct a comprehensive examination of the automatic voter registration process to determine the cause or causes that allowed individuals to improperly register to vote and shall determine and implement the corrective measures needed to prevent improper registration so that automatic voter registration can resume on January 1, 2022. Provides that the Board shall report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the cause or causes of improper automatic voter registration and the corrective measures taken, together with its recommendations to prevent the recurrence of improper automatic voter registration on or before December 31, 2021. Provides the Board with rulemaking authority. Effective immediately.
Title
SUSPEND-AUTOMATIC VOTER REG
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5224&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5224.htm |