IL HB5221 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Employee Disability Act. Provides that the term "eligible employee" as used in the Act includes firefighters employed as full-time paramedics or firefighters who perform paramedic duties.
Title
DISABILITY BENEFIT-FIREFIGHTER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1143 |
2018-11-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-11-28 | House | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 045-005-001 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 15, 2018 |
2018-11-14 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 095-014-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-002-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 011-003-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-008-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-003-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 345 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |