IL HB5212 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Truth in Accounting Act of 2010 and amends the State Comptroller Act and the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability Act. Prohibits the General Assembly from passing appropriation bills until it adopts a joint resolution reflecting for that fiscal year the State's estimated income, balance sheet, cash flow, and surplus or deficit. Requires the Commission's annual March estimates to include the State's estimated income, balance sheet, cash flow, and surplus or deficit, based on full accrual accounting standards developed by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board. Requires electronic publication of appropriation bills and amendments before legislative committee consideration or General Assembly passage. Provides that the State's financial accounting and reporting standards shall comply with full accrual accounting standards developed by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board. Requires the Comptroller to publish a Consolidated Annual Financial Report based on full accrual accounting principles. Effective immediately.
Title
TRUTH IN ACCOUNTING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-048-000 | |
2010-05-25 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-05-25 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2010-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-04-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-04-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2010-04-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-16 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-044-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-03-16 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-03-16 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-03-16 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-03-16 | Objects to Motion Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-03-16 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-03-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-03-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2010-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2010-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2010-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5212&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5212.htm |