IL HB5198 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the portion of a site or facility that receives, separates, stores, and converts post-use polymers into crude oil, fuels, or other raw materials or intermediate or final products or feedstocks using a pyrolysis or gasification process and is regulated under the State's air, water, and waste regulations applicable to manufacturing facilities is not a pollution control facility under the Act. Provides that the definition of "waste" does not include post-use polymers or nonrecycled feedstocks processed through pyrolysis or gasification. Makes changes to the definition for "municipal waste incineration" in provisions concerning municipal waste incineration emission standards. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
POLLUTION CONTROL FACILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-020-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 012-006-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.16b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.299 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.336 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.366 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.367 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |