IL HB5190 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Secured Transactions Article of the Uniform Commercial Code. Provides that a person may not cause to be presented for filing a financing statement or amendment that the person knows or reasonably should know: is not related to a valid lien, a valid security agreement, or a judgment of a court of competent jurisdiction; is for an improper purpose or purposes, such as to harass, hinder, defraud, or otherwise interfere with any person; or contains materially false or misleading information. Imposes criminal penalties for violations and civil liability to injured persons. Requires the Secretary of State to make available a form affidavit to provide notice of a fraudulent financing statement or amendment. Contains provisions regarding: filing a fraudulent filing affidavit; additional documentation supporting a filing; review of documentation; termination of a financing statement or amendment; fees; notice; reinstatement; liability; effectiveness; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
UCC-FRAUDULENT FINANCING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0836 |
2012-07-20 | House | Effective Date July 20, 2012 |
2012-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
810 | 5 | 9-501.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
810 | 5 | 9-510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
810 | 5 | 9-516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |