IL HB5172 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Specifies that the notice in contested case hearings must include an enclosure that notifies the recipient of the ability to request interpretive assistance for the hearing and to receive language assistance in translating the contents of the notice. Provides that an administrative law judge has the duty to inquire and determine whether a self-represented litigant or witness in a hearing needs interpretive assistance to participate in or understand the hearing. Authorizes any self-represented litigant, witness, or indigent person to request, at any time during the course of a hearing, interpretive assistance needed to participate in or understand the hearing. Provides that, if interpretive assistance is requested by a self-represented litigant, a witness, or an indigent person or if interpretive assistance is determined to be necessary by the administrative law judge, the administrative agency must appoint a foreign language interpreter at no cost to the person in need of the assistance for use in a substantive hearing. Authorizes an administrative agency to provide interpretive assistance during a nonsubstantive hearing through use of an interpreter who is not a foreign language interpreter, provided the administrative law judge examines the interpreter for competency for the purposes of the nonsubstantive hearing. Requires all persons appointed to provide interpretive assistance in substantive and nonsubstantive hearings to make certain affirmations. Contains provisions concerning waiver of these language assistance provisions.
Title
ADMIN HEARINGS-INTERPRETERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 21, 2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-039-000 |
2024-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 008-003-000 |
2024-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Appropriations-General Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-General Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-02-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-25.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 10-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |