IL HB5171 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Veterans Home Compensation Act. Provides that a benefit of $100,000 is payable to the surviving spouse or next of kin of a person who: (1) died of pneumonia caused by waterborne bacteria; and (2) was a resident of an Illinois Veterans Home at the time of death. Provides that a claim under the Act shall be filed no more than 5 years after the death of an eligible person. Provides that a claim under the Act must be determined within one year after the application for the claim is filed. Provides that the Attorney General and the Court of Claims may jointly adopt rules and procedures for the implementation of the Act. Provides that the compensation provided for in the Act is in addition to, and not exclusive of, any pension rights, death benefits, or other compensation otherwise payable by law. Amends the Court of Claims Act to grant the court jurisdiction over claims filed under the Veterans Home Compensation Act. Provides that the Court may direct immediate payment of claims pursuant to the Veterans Home Compensation Act. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS HOME COMPENSATION ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 505 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5171&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5171.htm |