IL HB5170 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Environmental Covenants Act. Removes language providing that "environmental response project" includes a plan or work that is performed for environmental remediation of any site or facility in response to contamination at specified sites or facilities. Provides instead that "environmental response project" includes a plan or work that is performed or conducted to clean up, remediate, eliminate, investigate, minimize, mitigate, or prevent the release or threatened release of contaminants affecting real property in order to protect public health or welfare or the environment. Removes the definition of "State".
Title
ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSE PROJECT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Energy & Environment Committee; 028-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 122 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |