IL HB5161 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority Act. Creates the Professionalized Street Outreach Workers Task Force under the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority. Provides the Task Force shall examine best practices for training and professionalizing street outreach staff and hold public hearings for recommendations on how to professionalize street outreach through training and accountability. Provides for Task Force members. Requires the Authority to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019. Repeals Task Force provision on January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
STREET OUTREACH WORKERS TF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5161&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5161.htm |