IL HB5158 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for grants to specified organizations as deemed appropriate by the Department for purposes of administering preapprenticeship workforce development programs that support education and training programming targeted to individuals under the age of 18 who reside in underserved areas in specified fields. Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Community College Board for grants to community college districts and public high schools for the purposes of administering the 21st Century Employment grant program. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DCEO/ICCB-GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5158&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB5158.pdf |