IL HB5156 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Tenants' Right to Organize Act. Provides that tenants receiving tenant-based rental assistance in the form of partial rent subsidy from any county, municipal, State, or federal source have the right to establish, operate, and participate in a resident organization for the purpose of addressing issues related to their living environment, which includes the terms and conditions of their tenancy as well as activities related to housing and community development. Provides that tenants may not be retaliated against for asserting these rights. Requires housing authorities to: (i) recognize legitimate tenant organizations; (ii) solicit comments from all legitimate tenant organizations not less than once each year; and (iii) meaningfully respond in writing no later than 60 days after receiving a comment from a legitimate tenant organization. Requires each owner of a rental housing development that receives federal low-income housing tax credits (LIHTC) to: (1) recognize legitimate resident organizations; and (2) not retaliate against any tenant because of his or her association with a legitimate resident organization. Requires housing authorities and owners of LIHTC rental housing developments to allow tenants and tenant organizers to conduct, without having to obtain prior permission, certain activities related to the establishment or operation of a tenant organization, including distributing leaflets, convening regularly scheduled tenant organization meetings in a space on-site and accessible to tenants, and other activities. Provides that if a housing authority or owner of a LIHTC rental housing development takes adverse action against a tenant who is a member of a tenant organization, there shall be a rebuttable presumption that such adverse action is an act of retaliation. Requires the Illinois Housing Development Authority to establish enforcement protocols and annually submit reports to the General Assembly with data summarizing the number of outstanding tenant complaints and the average close time for tenant complaints. Provides that implementation of the Act is contingent on the enactment of the federal Tenants' Right to Organize Act.
Title
TENANTS RIGHT TO ORGANIZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5156&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5156.htm |