IL HB5153 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to execute and deliver an easement for maintenance purposes of specified land in Cook County to the Village of Forest Park for $1. Effective immediately.
Title
EASEMENT IDOT-FOREST PARK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |