IL HB5147 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Labor Law. Provides that, before a child may be issued a permit to work as a model, a trust account must be established providing, at a minimum, that: at least 15% (or a greater percentage as determined by rule) of the gross earnings of the child model shall be deposited into the account; the funds in the account shall be available only to the child model; the funds shall be held by a bank, corporate fiduciary, or trust company, as those terms are defined in the Corporate Fiduciary Act; and the funds in the account shall become available to the child model upon the child model attaining the age of 18 years. Provides that the Department of Labor shall adopt rules to implement these provisions.
Title
CHILD LABOR-CHILD MODEL-TRUST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-012-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |