IL HB5145 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Electric Vehicle Charger Grant Act. Provides that any State agency that disburses grant funds for electric vehicle charging stations must include provisions in the criteria for awarding grant funds that encourage the use of equity eligible contractors by the grantees. Provides that the provisions shall include, but not be limited to, additional points to those grantees who commit to exclusively using equity eligible contractors, a portion of the grant funds devoted exclusively for equity eligible contractors, and inclusion of aspirational goals for all grantees to use equity eligible contractors. Effective immediately.
Title
EV CHARGER GRANT ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5145&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5145.htm |