IL HB5139 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Extends the repeal date of the Cable and Video Competition Law of 2007 from December 31, 2020 to December 31, 2025. Extends the expiration date of Illinois Commerce Commission authorizations to provide cable and video services from December 31, 2023 to December 31, 2028. Extends the repeal date of the Universal Telephone Service Protection Law of 1985 from December 31, 2020 to December 31, 2025. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES REPEAL EXTENSION
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-1200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 21-1601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 21-401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5139&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5139.htm |