IL HB5139 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Regulatory Sandbox Act. Creates the regulatory sandbox to enable persons to obtain limited access to the Illinois marketplace in order to test innovations in financial products or services. Provides requirements for approval to enter the regulatory sandbox, the application fee, and approval or denial time. Provides requirements for operating an innovation in the regulatory sandbox and extending a test period. Contains provisions regarding rules and judicial review of the administration of this Act. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
REGULATORY SANDBOX ACT
Sponsors
Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 004-006-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-004-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-001-001 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |