IL HB5133 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Law Enforcement Officer-Worn Body Camera Act. Provides that notwithstanding any provisions of the Act to the contrary, the law enforcement agency: (1) shall within 5 business days after an officer-involved death or the officer's use of force likely to cause death or great bodily harm, publicly release the names and officer-worn body camera recordings of all officers who committed the officer-involved death or force likely to cause death or great bodily harm; and (2) shall publicly release the names and officer-worn body camera recordings of all officers who have committed an officer-involved death since January 1, 2014; and (3) may, on a case-by-case basis in matters of significant public interest and after consultation with the chief of police of the law enforcement agency whose officer's recorded the officer-worn body camera recordings and the Attorney General, publicly release any other officer-worn body camera recordings that may not otherwise be releasable under a Freedom of Information Act request. Provides that the law enforcement agency shall not release an officer-worn body camera recording under if the following persons inform the chief of police, orally or in writing, that they do not consent to its release: (1) for an officer-worn body camera recording of an officer-involved death, the decedent's next of kin; and (2) for an officer-worn body camera recording of the officer's use of force likely to cause death or great bodily harm, the individual against whom the force likely to cause death or great bodily harm was used, or if the individual is a minor or unable to consent, the individual's next of kin.
Title
OFFICER-WORN BODY CAM-DISCLOSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 706 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5133&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5133.htm |