IL HB5131 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board shall require that schools provide daily time for supervised, unstructured, child-directed play for all students in kindergarten through grade 8. Provides that the time allotted for play must be at least 60 minutes and play periods shall be at least 15 consecutive minutes in length. Provides that play time must allow for unstructured play, may include organized games, and shall not include the use of computers, tablets, phones, or videos. Prohibits the withholding of play time as a disciplinary or punitive action. Provides that play time does not count as a course of physical education and that a course of physical education does not count towards the daily time for play. Provides that play time shall be considered clock hours. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-ELEMENTARY SCHOOL-PLAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5131&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5131.htm |