IL HB5129 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the Interference With Penal Institution Article of the Code. Provides that one year of imprisonment shall be added to the sentence of a person who commits bringing contraband into a penal institution or unauthorized bringing or delivery of contraband into a penal institution by an employee by using an unmanned aerial vehicle. Provides that a person who knowingly and intentionally operates an unmanned aerial vehicle below the navigable airspace over a State penal institution is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that this provision does not apply to an employee who operates the unmanned aerial vehicle within the scope of his or her employment, or a person who receives prior permission from the penal institution to operate the unmanned aerial vehicle. Provides that a person who knowingly and intentionally captures images or data of a State penal institution through the operation of an unmanned aerial vehicle is guilty of a Class 4 felony. Provides that this provision does not apply to an employee who captures images or data of a State penal institution through the operation of an unmanned aerial vehicle within the scope of his or her employment, or a person who receives prior permission from the penal institution to capture images or data of a State penal institution through the operation of an unmanned aerial vehicle. Defines "State penal institution" and "unmanned aerial vehicle".
Title
CRIM CD-AERIAL DRONE-PRISON
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 31A-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 31A-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 31A-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 31A-1.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 31A-1.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5129&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5129.htm |