IL HB5128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the River Conservancy Districts Act. In the case of a board representing a district that embraces Franklin and Jefferson counties, provides that trustees shall be appointed as follows: (1) for municipalities in the district with a population of 6,500 or more, one trustee shall be appointed per 6,500 in population from each municipality by the presiding officer of the municipality with the advice and consent of the corporate authorities of the municipality; and (2) for each county in the district, one trustee shall be appointed from the area within the district outside of each municipality and one trustee shall be appointed at large for each county, appointed by the chairperson of the county board with the advice and consent of the county board. Provides that these requirements only apply to appointments made on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
RIVER CONSERVE DIST-TRUSTEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2105 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5128&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5128.htm |