IL HB5123 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that a gas utility must waive or not assess any demand charges on non-residential customers with Rate GDS-5 seasonal gas delivery if the gas is used for agricultural grain drying purposes if, as determined by the United States Department of Agriculture National Agricultural Statistics Service by November 1 of that contract year, 35% or less of the corn crop in the State has been harvested. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-GAS-HARVEST WAIVER
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-03-17 | Motion Prevailed | |
2010-03-12 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading | |
2010-01-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5123&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5123.htm |