IL HB5114 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to create a grant program that provides funds to organizations that test student athletes for being at risk of sudden cardiac death, including, but not limited to, hypertrophic cardiomyopathy.
Title
DPH-SUDDEN CARDIAC DEATH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5114&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5114.htm |