IL HB5112 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no insurance carrier that issues policies of automobile insurance in this State shall assign driving record points, cancel, refuse to issue or renew, or charge a higher premium rate for any policy of automobile insurance for the reason that the insured has been involved in a motor vehicle crash and was not at fault. Provides that no insurance carrier that issues policies of automobile insurance in this State shall cancel, refuse to issue or renew, or charge a higher premium for any policy of automobile insurance for the reason that the insured had lower liability limits with a previous insurer without actuarial justification. Provides that the provisions do not apply to an insured who has been convicted of a homicide or assault arising out of the operation of any motor vehicle or driving while under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or any combination thereof. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act applies to policies of automobile insurance that are amended, issued, delivered, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
INS CD/NO-FAULT AUTO CRASHES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5112&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5112.htm |