IL HB5103 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In a provision concerning coverage of certain cancer screenings, adds having a high level of CA-125, as indicated by a blood test screening, to the definition of "at risk for ovarian cancer". Provides that "surveillance tests for ovarian cancer" means all medically viable methods for the detection and diagnosis of ovarian cancer, including, but not limited to, ultrasounds, magnetic resonance imagings (MRIs), x-rays, computed tomography (CT) scans, and CA-125 blood test screenings (instead of an annual screening using (i) CA-125 serum tumor marker testing, (ii) transvaginal ultrasound, (iii) pelvic examination).
Title
INS CD-CANCER SCREENINGS
Sponsors
Rep. Jed Davis [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356u | Amended Code | Citation Text |