IL HB5101 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. In provisions concerning services provided by electric utilities to alternative retail electric suppliers, requires that customers are enrolled with an alternative retail electric supplier through the municipal aggregation process described in the Illinois Power Agency Act when certain electric utilities file a tariff. Creates a natural gas aggregation process by municipalities, townships, and counties. Provides that the corporate authorities of a municipality, township board, or county board of a county may adopt an ordinance under which it may aggregate residential and small commercial retail natural gas loads located within the municipality, township, or county and may enter into service agreements to facilitate for those loads the sale and purchase of natural gas and related services and equipment. Provides that a single billing option shall be offered to customers for both the services provided by the alternative gas supplier and the delivery services provided by the gas utility, provided that the customers are enrolled with the natural gas aggregation process. Requires a gas utility to file a tariff that allows alternative gas suppliers to issue single bills to residential and small commercials customers, provided that the customers are enrolled with the natural gas aggregation process. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-ELECTRIC/NATURAL GAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 020-000-000
2018-04-09HouseRemains in Public Utilities Committee
2018-04-09HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Public Utilities Committee; 010-006-000
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220516-101AAmended CodeCitation Text
220516-118Amended CodeCitation Text
220519-107New CodeSee Bill Text
220519-135Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback