IL HB5077 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Chicago Metropolitan Agency for Planning to fulfill its obligations under the Regional Planning Act, to enhance capacity to support additional comprehensive local and regional planning, and to facilitate access to federal funding. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$CMAP-VARIOUS FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5077&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB5077.pdf |