IL HB5072 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Appliance Standards Act. Directs the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to adopt minimum efficiency standards for covered products. Provides for testing, certification, and labeling of covered products. Contains provisions concerning enforcement of the Act's requirements. Provides for administrative rulemaking by the Agency. Makes findings. Defines terms.
Title
EPA-APPLIANCE STANDARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5072&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5072.htm |