IL HB5065 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the Public Act may be referred to as the Safe Firearm Storage Act. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to store or leave a firearm outside of that person's immediate possession or control (rather than within premises under his or her control if the person knows or has reason to believe that a minor under the age of 14 years who does not have a Firearm Owners Identification Card is likely to gain access to the firearm without the lawful permission of the minor's parent, guardian, or person having charge of the minor, and the minor causes death or great bodily harm with the firearm) unless the firearm is secured in a manner that renders it inaccessible to anyone but the owner or another lawfully authorized user: (1) by a device or mechanism, other than the firearm safety, designed to render a firearm temporarily inoperable; or (2) locked box or container. Deletes provisions that the law does not apply: (1) if a minor under 14 years of age gains access to a firearm and uses it in a lawful act of self-defense or defense of another; or (2) to any firearm obtained by a minor under the age of 14 because of an unlawful entry of the premises by the minor or another person. Deletes a provision that the firearm may be placed in some other location that a reasonable person would believe to be secure from a minor under the age of 14 years. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
CRIM CD-SAFE STORAGE FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |