IL HB5060 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $9,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Public Health for continued funding to the Illinois Association of Free and Charitable Clinics. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$PUBLIC HEALTH-CLINICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5060&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB5060.pdf |