IL HB5047 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0939
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0939
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Portable Electronics Insurance Act. Provides that a business entity that is a licensed insurance producer or insurer (supervising entity) shall maintain a registry of vendor locations that are authorized to sell or solicit portable electronics insurance coverage in the State and that, upon request by the Director of Insurance and with 10 days notice to the supervising entity, the registry shall be open to inspection and examination by the Director during the regular business hours of the supervising entity. Makes changes to the provision requiring brochures or other written materials be made available to prospective customers at every location where portable electronics insurance is offered. Deletes language concerning notice with regard to the termination of portable electronics insurance and provides instead that whenever notice or correspondence with respect to a policy of portable electronics insurance is required pursuant to the provision concerning termination of portable electronics insurance or is otherwise required by law, it shall be in writing and sent within the notice period, if any, specified within the statute or regulation. Sets forth provisions concerning notice requirements.
Title
ELECTRONICS INS-VENDORS-CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] |
Sen. William Haine [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0939 |
2012-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 007-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2012-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 021-000-000 |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-02-22 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 136 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 136 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 136 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |