IL HB5045 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Central Management Services for its FY17 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
$CMS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |