IL HB5045 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that if foreclosure proceedings for a residential building have been commenced, it is the responsibility of the mortgagee, judgment creditor, or other lien holder to adequately heat the residential building to prevent frozen pipes.
Title
MUNI-FORECLOSURE-FROZEN PIPES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading | |
2010-01-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5045&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5045.htm |