IL HB5031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0955
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0955
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Repeals a provision concerning cross-agency master service agreements between State agencies and human service providers. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-CROSS-AGENCY AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0955 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-37a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |