IL HB5030 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Requires an agency that proposes a new rule or an amendment to an existing rule that may have an impact on persons or entities in downstate Illinois to consider specified methods for reducing the impact of that rulemaking and provide an opportunity to participate in the rulemaking process before or during the notice period utilizing specified techniques. Requires each agency to include in its regulatory agenda summary a statement of whether a rule will affect persons or entities in downstate Illinois. Defines "downstate Illinois". Effective immediately.
Title
ADMIN PRO-DOWNSTATE ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 1-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5030&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5030.htm |