IL HB5025 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-08 - Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-08 - Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $100,000, or so much thereof as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Central Management Services for all expenses related to the African Descent-Citizens Reparations Commission.
Title
$AFRICAN DESCENT COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-01-08 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5025&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB5025.pdf |