IL HB5024 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill as introduced with the following changes. With respect to the Early Childhood Access Consortium for Equity Act, removes the changes concerning the appointment of members to the advisory committee. Removes the provisions concerning goals and metrics.
Title
HIGHR ED-EARLY CHLD CONSORTIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 28 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 28 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 28 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 28 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 28 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 65.125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |