IL HB5023 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Eliminates a provision providing that unexpended grant funds for I-SEARCH Units shall be deposited into the Missing and Exploited Children Trust Fund. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall report the disappearance of any child under its custody or guardianship to the local law enforcement agency working in cooperation with the State Missing Persons Clearinghouse (rather than the I-SEARCH Unit located nearest the last known whereabouts of the child. Amends the Intergovernmental Missing Child Recovery Act of 1984. Eliminates the I-SEARCH Unit and corresponding programs and instead provides that the Department of State Police shall establish a State Missing Persons Clearinghouse as a resource to promote an immediate and effective community response to missing children. Requires the State Missing Persons Clearinghouse to establish and maintain contacts with other state missing persons clearinghouses and missing persons non-profit organizations. Requires the Director of the Department to report by June 30 (rather than December 31) of each year to the Governor and the General Assembly on the operations of the State Missing Persons Clearinghouse (rather than I-SEARCH program) for the previous calendar (rather than fiscal) year. Repeals a provision concerning an I-SEARCH program's eligibility to receive State grants to help defray the costs of operation. Repeals a provision requiring the Department to monitor operations of all I-SEARCH Units and determine the program's eligibility to receive State grants. Effective January 1, 2013.
Title
MISSING PERSONS CLEARINGHOUSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0938 |
2012-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 24, 2012 |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott E. Penny |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 40 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 4.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |