IL HB5014 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Attorney General Act. Provides that the Attorney General shall investigate criminal misconduct and civil rights violations committed against persons in the custody of the Department of Corrections committed by an employee of the Department of Corrections if the State's Attorney of the county where the penal institution that has the custody of the incarcerated person is located fails to investigate, prosecute, or bring an action concerning the allegations and the Attorney General believes that there is probable cause to bring a civil rights action or criminal prosecution against the employee of the Department of Corrections and to prosecute or bring that action in the circuit court. Provides that the Attorney General shall not investigate the criminal misconduct or civil rights violation if the statute of limitations has expired for that action or prosecution.
Title
ATTORNEY GENERAL-DOC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 205 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5014&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5014.htm |