IL HB5008 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Ryan Spain
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Adds provisions concerning pricing of water assets, meaning a for profit water utility or water distribution company and its tangible and intangible properties, by an Illinois governmental purchaser. Provides that the determination of value or price for the purchase or acquisition of water assets by the Illinois governmental purchaser: may not distinguish, penalize, or increase the value or price to be paid by an Illinois governmental purchaser based on specified characteristics of the purchaser; or may not use as a factor any excess of replacement cost new minus depreciation over the value of price based on fair market value of the water assets, as determined by what a willing buyer in the private sector would value, price, or pay for the water assets. Provides for application of the provisions to contracts already in place. Contains a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-WATER ASSETS PRICING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseRemains in Public Utilities Committee
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Public Utilities Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Public Utilities Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Public Utilities Committee; Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-02HouseTo Regulatory Matters Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22055-119New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback