IL HB5008 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health and the Department of State Police shall collaboratively establish a set fee for livescan services that all approved vendors offering livescan services under the Act and Nursing Home Care Act may not exceed. Provides that any livescan vendor meeting certain specified requirements shall be certified by the Department of State Police for participation. Provides that all participating livescan vendors shall comply with the established fee requirements within 30 days after being notified that a fee has been set. Makes other changes. Makes corresponding changes in the Nursing Home Care Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LIVESCAN VENDOR-SERVICE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 2-201.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |