IL HB4999 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a commercial driver training school in the State may administer the CDL test to a student who has successfully completed a commercial driver's education course. Provides that any testing administered must satisfy the specified guidelines required under federal and State law. Requires the Secretary of State to adopt rules.
Title
VEH CD-CDL THIRD PARTY TESTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4999&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4999.htm |