IL HB4998 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services' Bureau of Homeless Services and Supportive Housing within the Office of Family Support Services to annually review and collect data on the number of military veterans receiving services or benefits under the Emergency and Transitional Housing Program, the Emergency Food Program, the Homeless Prevention Program, the Supporting Housing Program, and the Prince Home at Manteno administered by the Department of Veterans' Affairs. Provides that the Bureau may request and receive the cooperation of the Department of Veterans' Affairs and any other State agency that is relevant to the collection of the required data. Requires the Bureau to annually submit to the General Assembly a written report that details the number of military veterans served under each program no later than December 31, 2023 and every December 31 thereafter.
Title
DHS-VET DATA-SUPPORTIVE SRVCS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0961 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Healthcare Access and Availability; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Luft |